Rudd v. Jonesboro Arkansas, City of et al

Plaintiff: Teresa Rudd
Defendant: Jonesboro Arkansas, City of, Ronald Marsh, Keith Baggett and Michael Yates
Case Number: 3:2013cv00173
Filed: July 26, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in accordance with the 56 Opinion and Order and the September 9, 2016 Order, plaintiff Teresa Rudd's claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/1/2017. (jak)
September 9, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 42 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants did not address Ms. Rudd's Fourth Amendment claims in their motion for summary judgment, and Ms. Rudd did not raise those claims in her response. The parties are directe d to notify the Court within seven days of the entry of this Order as to whether any Fourth Amendment claims remain pending in this action. In regard to Ms. Rudds other claims, the Court finds that Officer Baggett, Officer Marsh, Chief Yates, and the City of Jonesboro are entitled to summary judgment. With the exception of any remaining Fourth Amendment claim or failure to train claim derived from a Fourth Amendment violation, Ms. Rudd's claims against these defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/9/2016. (jak) (Docket text modified on 9/9/2016 to correct the description of the document filed.) (thd).
September 2, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial. This case is removed from the trial calendar for the week of 9/19/2016. The Court will issue an Order on defendants' motion for summary judgment by separate Order, and the Court will reset the trial date and pretrial deadlines in this matter by separate Order, if necessary. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/2/2016. (jak)
June 19, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 19 Motion to Compel. The Court will set new discovery deadlines, expert disclosure deadlines, dispositive motion deadlines, and a new trial date by separate order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/19/2015. (jak)
April 16, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER removing this case from the trial docket for the week of April 20, 2015. Upon receiving counsel's status reports and resolving Ms. Rudd's motion to compel, the Court will set new deadlines regarding discovery, expert disclosures, and dispositive motions; and to set a new trial date. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/16/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rudd v. Jonesboro Arkansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Rudd
Represented By: Ursula Y. Holmes
Represented By: Darrell J. O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonesboro Arkansas, City of
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Marsh
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Baggett
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Yates
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?