Honeycutt v. Womack et al

Plaintiff: Steven M Honeycutt
Defendant: Marty Boyd, Jack McCann, Brandon Womack, Ron Richardson and Justin Rolland
Case Number: 3:2013cv00188
Filed: August 23, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 34 Order, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/18/2014. (jak)
October 30, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff within fourteen days to show cause why he failed to respond to the Motion 22 . If he fails to do so, this case will be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/30/2014. (jak)
March 10, 2014 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing service for Defendant Brandon Womack. The Clerk shall prepare summons for the defendant and the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the 2 Complaint and summons on defendant Womack without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Defendants McCann, Boyd, Richardson, and Rolland are dismissed from Honeycutt's complaint, without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/10/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Honeycutt v. Womack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Rolland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven M Honeycutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?