Holt v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Darcy Holt
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2013cv00193
Filed: August 29, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 28 Order, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/18/2014. (jak)
June 16, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court hereby withdraws its previous 24 Order of Dismissal and 25 Judgment. The parties did not consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge; therefore, the Court lacked jurisdiction to enter these Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/16/2014. (jak)
April 25, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion to Withdraw. It is therefore ordered that attorney Anthony W. Bartels is hereby appointed to represent plaintiff in all further proceedings. The Clerk is directed to send counsel a copy of this Order and Local Rules 83.7. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/25/2014. (jak)
April 16, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 MOTION to Extend Time. Attorney Jim Lyons is hereby appointed, in conformity with Rule 83.7 of the Local Rules for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas, to represent plaintiff in all further proceedings. The Clerk is d irected to send counsel a copy of this Order and Local Rule 83.7. Counsel shall access the file from CM/ECF. If counsel is unable to obtain the file from CM/ECF, counsel should contact Mrs. LaShawn Coleman at 501-604-5174, and a copy of the file, or any portion thereof, will be provided free of charge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/16/2014. (jak)
March 13, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a statement with the Court within thirty days of this Order showing that she has talked with at least three attorneys, the date she contacted them, and what they told her. Copies of any letters received by Plaintiff from attorneys who refuse, for whatever reason, to represent her are also permissible for submission to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/13/2014. (jak)
September 4, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Darcy Holt as incomplete. The Court hereby directs Plaintiff to provide within fourteen days of this Order some explanation as to any source(s) of income and or means of support. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/4/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darcy Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?