Shelby County Health Care Corporation v. Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Shelby County Health Care Corporation
Defendant: Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, Medford Farm Partnership, Aaron Medford and Barbara Ford
Case Number: 3:2013cv00194
Filed: August 30, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2015 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 79 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 81 Motion for Attorney Fees. The previous orders awarding Defendants attorneys' fees and costs, 40 & 63 , are vacated. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/12/2015. (jak)
October 19, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT based on the 77 Order, this case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/19/2015. (jak)
September 3, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 68 Motion to Stay. Accordingly, upon the posting of supersedeas bond in the amount of $11,920.42, the Judgment is stayed pending the outcome of the appeal. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/3/2014. (jak)
August 1, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion for Attorney Fees. Accordingly, Defendants are entitled to $6,003.00 in attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/1/2014. (jak)
July 9, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in accordance with 57 Order, Judgment is hereby entered dismissing plaintiff's complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/9/2014. (jak)
May 14, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 34 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs. Accordingly, Defendant Ford is entitled to $5,740.00 in attorney's fees and $164.19 in costs, for a total of $5,904.19, from Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/14/2014. (jak)
April 10, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/10/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelby County Health Care Corporation v. Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby County Health Care Corporation
Represented By: Curtis Henry Goetsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medford Farm Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Medford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?