Cox v. Capital Quarries Company Inc

Plaintiff: Patricia D Cox
Defendant: Capital Quarries Company Inc
Case Number: 3:2013cv00195
Filed: August 30, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice pursuant to settlement. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/8/2014. (jak)
June 18, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/18/2014. (jak)
December 31, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing Patricia D. Cox's claims against Farmer Holding Company Inc. without prejudice. Farmer Holding Company Inc's 7 Motion is denied as moot. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/31/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Capital Quarries Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Quarries Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia D Cox
Represented By: Larry J. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?