Frazier v. Cawley et al

Plaintiff: Michael D Frazier
Defendant: Cali Henderson, John Cawley, Blanchard and Dan Langston
Case Number: 3:2013cv00221
Filed: October 16, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 12 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/2/2014. (jak)
December 3, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 7 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/3/2013. (jak)
October 23, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to send Mr. Frazier a copy of this Order and a new IFP application form. Mr. Frazier must return the completed application within thirty days or submit the $400.00 filing fee within thirty days. Further, Mr. Fr azier is directed to submit an Amended Complaint within thirty days containing only one constitutional claim. He may not include multiple claims arising from different factual scenarios and different time periods. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/23/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. Cawley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cali Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?