California Equity Management Group Inc v. Independent Bank et al

Plaintiff: California Equity Management Group Inc
Defendant: Independent Bank, RJ Investments LLC, Jim A Curtis, Michael F Rafferty, Regions Development Group LLC and John Does
Interpleader: Coast to Coast Medical LLC and F & H Ventures LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00227
Filed: October 24, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Cleburne
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND DIRECTING DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS HELD IN REGISTRY OF COURT. Plaintiff's 57 Motion is granted and the Court dismisses all claims raised, or which could have been raised, in this action with prejudice. The Court further directs the Clerk of the Court to immediately disburse all funds currently held in the Registry of the Court related to 3:13-cv-00227 KGB to separate Defendant R J Investments LLC, by and through its counsel of record in this matter, Thomas B. Staley. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/22/2015. (jak)
March 31, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion to Stay Summary Judgment. CEMG is directed to respond to Independent Bank's motions for summary judgment, 39 & 53 within fourteen days from the date of this Order. Also, at the request of the parties, the Court prev iously entered an Order directing the Clerk of the Court to remit payment of $9,037.59 on October 1, 2014, directly to the Crittenden County Tax Collector, Ellen Foote. The Clerk made that payment, but the Crittenden County Tax Collector returne d it, apparently due to RJ Investments LLC already making the payment. The parties are directed to submit status reports regarding the status of these funds within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/31/2015. (jak)
August 5, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to immediately release funds from the registry account to defendant RJ Investments LLC, in the amount of $12,561.32 for previous expenses related to the parcel; remit monthly payments from the registry accoun t to RJ Investments in the amount of $1,080.00 by the 10th of each month; and remit payment in the amount of $9,037.59 on October 1, 2014, directly to the Crittenden County Tax Collector, Ellen Foote. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/5/2014. (jak)
June 20, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion for Leave to Amend and Motion to Remand. The Court denies the addition of the Commissioner as a named defendant and the motion to remand. The Court grants the motion for leave to amend the compla int to clarify factual allegations and correct the legal description of the real property at issue. Amended Complaint due within ten days of this Order. The Court denies 12 Motion to terminate interpleader and distribute funds. Parties shall file a status report within 14 days of the date of this Order. 10 Motion for leave to file a supplemental answer is granted. RJ Investments and Mr. Curtis shall file their supplemental answer within 14 days of the date that CEMG files its amended complaint. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/20/2014. (jak)
April 14, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion. The Court will conduct a hearing on April 18, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 4C at the Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse, 500 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, Arkansas, 72201. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/14/2014. (jak)
October 31, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Circuit Clerk of Crittenden County to deposit the monthly lease payments received from Coast to Coast Medical LLC, and F&H Ventures LLC, into the registry of this Court. Further, Coast to Coast Medical, LLC, and F&H Ventures, LLC, are directed to deposit future monthly lease payments directly into the registry of this Court. Checks must be made payable to Clerk, United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas, and must reference the case number. The Clerk of this Court is directed to accept these funds for deposit, invest them in an interest bearing account until additional orders from the Court, and to deduct from the income earned on the investment a fee not to exceed that authorized by the Judicial Conference of the United States and set by the Director of the Administrative Office. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/31/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Equity Management Group Inc v. Independent Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Equity Management Group Inc
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Represented By: Michael B. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Bank
Represented By: Mark Wilson Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RJ Investments LLC
Represented By: Thomas B. Staley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim A Curtis
Represented By: Thomas B. Staley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F Rafferty
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Development Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Coast to Coast Medical LLC
Represented By: Thomas Franklin Donaldson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: F & H Ventures LLC
Represented By: Thomas Franklin Donaldson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?