Grant v. Blytheville Arkansas, City of

Plaintiff: Johnny Grant
Defendant: Blytheville Arkansas, City of
Case Number: 3:2013cv00231
Filed: October 28, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court has reconsidered and stands by its earlier analysis. Grant's motion to set aside the Judgment as a matter of law for the City, and have a trial, 48 , is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/3/2015. (jak)
May 7, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing Grant's 1 Complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/7/2015. (ks)
January 12, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Blytheville's report, 28 , noted and appreciated. Grant must respond to all pending discovery by 28 January 2015. The parties should schedule now any needed deposition for February. Joint status report due 13 February 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/12/2015. (jak)
June 9, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion for Default Judgment; denying as moot 16 Motion for Leave to File. The Court therefore directs the Clerk to set aside the 8 entry of default. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/9/2014. (ks)
March 31, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff Grant to provide proof of service on Defendant City of Blytheville by 25 April 2014, or the Court will dismiss Grant's complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/31/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Blytheville Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Grant
Represented By: Larry J. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blytheville Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?