Mitchell v. Mills

Plaintiff: Kevin Martin Mitchell, Sr
Defendant: Larry Mills and Doyle Ramey
Case Number: 3:2013cv00238
Filed: November 5, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to mail Mitchell a copy of this Order, along with a new complaint form and a new application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/12/2014. (jak)
December 20, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 7 Order, Mitchell's 2 Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/20/2013. (jak)
November 22, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/22/2013. (kcs)
November 15, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff a prison calculation sheet. Plaintiff must, within thirty days of the entry of this Order, file his properly completed prison calculation sheet. Plaintiff is reminded that the failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of this case, without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/15/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doyle Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Martin Mitchell, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?