Polston v. Bell et al

Plaintiff: Dalmar Polston
Defendant: E Bell, Clabourne Hicks and Mississippi County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2013cv00241
Filed: November 8, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 44 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/2/2015. (jak)
May 8, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 30 Proposed Findings and Recommendations as this Court's findings in all respects. It is therefore ordered that defendant Bell is dismissed from plaintiff's complaint, without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/8/2014. (jak)
December 16, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 4 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety. It is therefore ordered that Defendant Mississippi County Detention Facility is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Property allegations against defendants are dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/16/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polston v. Bell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalmar Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clabourne Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?