Rowlett v. Brennan Hart Construction Co et al

Plaintiff: Thomas Rowlett
Defendant: Superior Coating, Bill Downes, Brennan Hart Construction Co and Coventry Health & Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv00246
Filed: November 18, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 34 Order, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/10/2014. (jak)
May 5, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Conventry Health & Life Insurance and denying 22 Motion to Dismiss filed by Brenan Hart Construction Co. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/5/2014. (jak)
February 5, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff Thomas Rowlett has thirty days to amend his complaint to properly state an ERISA violation. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/5/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowlett v. Brennan Hart Construction Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Coating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Downes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brennan Hart Construction Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coventry Health & Life Insurance Company
Represented By: David S. Mitchell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Rowlett
Represented By: Richard A. Lusby
Represented By: Lela Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?