Spears v. Mississippi County Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: James Lee Spears, Jr
Defendant: Pope, Keith Hill, Hicks, Dale Cook, Doe and Colbert
Case Number: 3:2013cv00250
Filed: November 25, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendants' 98 Motion to Dismiss due to settlement and hereby dismisses with prejudice Plaintiff James Lee Spears's claims. The Court will retain jurisdiction over this matter for a period of 30 days to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/18/2014. (jak)
August 11, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 86 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court will extend the dispositive motions deadline to December 23, 2014, so that the parties have adequate time to complete discovery before dispositive motions are due. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/11/2014. (jak)
July 28, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 80 Motion to Set Aside Order; granting 82 Motion to Strike. The requests for admissions received by the Defendants on July 16, 2014, need not be answered. 81 Motion is denied as premature. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/28/2014. (jak)
July 15, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 74 Motion. Mr. Spears may propound no more than 25 requests for admission to each Defendant and he must wait for a Defendant's response to the requests for admission before propounding new requests for admission to that Defendant. Mr. Spears' request for court-appointed counsel is denied, without prejudice, for reasons previously stated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/15/2014. (jak)
May 6, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/6/2014. (jak)
April 28, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to re-issue summons for Defendant Pope at his last known address, as provided under seal. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, along with a copy of the 2 Complaint without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or the posting of security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/28/2014. (jak)
April 24, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Defendants to provide Mr. Spears copies of all documents and reports concerning the December 27, 2011 incident within fourteen days. Defendants are instructed to file these papers with the Court, if any such documents exist. If no other documents exist, Defendants should notify the Court of that fact within fourteen days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/24/2014. (jak)
April 3, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion for Reconsideration. Defendants are instructed to provide the "Jail Shift Report" for Defendant Hill beginning at 6:30 p.m. on December 26, 2011, until 6:30 p.m.on December 27, 2011, within fourteen days. Defendants are also instructed to provide the complete eight page incident report for September 19, 2013, within fourteen days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/3/2014. (jak)
February 24, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion to Set Aside ; denying 29 Motion to Compel. Service for Defendants Faulkner and Pope is set aside, and the Clerk of the Court is directed to modify the docket sheet to reflect this correction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/24/2014. (jak)
December 17, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 5 Partial Report and Recommendations in all respects. Mr. Spears's claims against the Mississippi County Detention Center are dismissed, with prejudice. In addition, his claims against Mississippi County are dismissed, as duplicative. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/17/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spears v. Mississippi County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hicks
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Cook
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colbert
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lee Spears, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?