Jones v. RK Enterprises of Blytheville Inc et al

Plaintiff: Trista Jones
Defendant: RK Enterprises of Blytheville Inc, Jahid Rahman, Mahmuda Rahman and Zinat R Khandekar
Case Number: 3:2013cv00252
Filed: November 26, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Motion for Reconsideration in all respects. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/7/2016. (jak)
March 21, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and 68 Supplemental Motion. Plaintiff is awarded $6,500 attorneys' fees and $2,639.90 costs from Defendants, for a total of $9,139.90. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/21/2016. (jak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/21/2016) (jak). (The correct main document was substituted as the attachment on 3/21/2016, pursuant to instructions from Chambers.) (thd).
May 13, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 49 Motion for Attorney Fees. Taking all factors into consideration, I believe $4,500 is a reasonable lawyers' fee and $1,581.92 reasonable costs in this case. Accordingly, Plaintiff is entitled to $6,081.92 from Defendants. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/13/2015. (jak)
April 15, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT based on the 47 Order, Plaintiff is entitled to $7,876.06 from Defendants. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/15/2015. (jak)
October 28, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 15 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Leave to File Amended and Substituted Complaint is granted. Accordingly, the Amended Complaint must be filed by 5 p.m. Tuesday, November 4, 2014. This case appears to be a good candidate for a settlement conference. If the parties agree, they should contact the Court and request a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/28/2014. (jak)
April 1, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this case without prejudice, under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/1/2014. [ORDER VACATED PER 6 ORDER] (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. RK Enterprises of Blytheville Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trista Jones
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RK Enterprises of Blytheville Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jahid Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahmuda Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zinat R Khandekar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?