Rose v. Mississippi County Arkansas et al

Plaintiff: Gregory Rose
Defendant: Mississippi County Arkansas, Dell Cook, Alonzo Cummins, Claboron Hicks, Jeff Thomas and Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2013cv00253
Filed: November 26, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 98 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Having considered the application pursuant to the guidelines and policies of the library fund, the Court orders that the Clerk of the Court disburse money from the library fund in the amount of $1,025.91 and distribute it to Glenn Lovett, Jr. A copy of this Order, together with the application, must be placed in the library fund file maintained by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/3/2016. (jak)
February 23, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Elonzo Cummings on the claims of Gregory Rose. The complaint of Gregory Rose is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/23/2016. (jak)
January 28, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER determining that the jury trial for this matter will begin at 9:15 a.m. on Monday, February 22, 2016, in Courtroom #4-D, Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse, 500 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, Arkansas. Counsel and parties should be present by 8:30 a.m. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/28/2016. (jak)
December 30, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL AND PROTECTIVE ORDER that designated records covered by this order shall remain confidential 69 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/30/2015. (lej)
November 25, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 47 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. 41 Motion to Dismiss is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/25/2014. (jak)
August 18, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 35 Partial Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's 33 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is denied. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order adopting the recommendation and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/18/2014. (jak)
July 10, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 32 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in all respects. Plaintiff's 31 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is denied. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/10/2014. (jak) Modified on 7/10/2014 to correct typographical error (mcz).
February 21, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 12 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. The complaint and amended complaint fail to state a claim upon which relief may be granted against defendants Mississippi County, Dell Cook, Claboron Hicks, Jeff Thomas, Jane Doe "Sergeant Peggy," and Luther Whitfield, so Gregory Rose's claims against them are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/21/2014. (jak)
January 28, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER deeming that service is appropriate for Defendant Alonzo Cummins. The Clerk of the Court shall prepare summons for Mr. Cummins and the U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the 1 Complaint, 5 Amended Complaint, and summons on Mr. Cummins without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/28/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. Mississippi County Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi County Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alonzo Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claboron Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?