McCullon et al v. Hitt et al

Plaintiff: Kerry Kendred, Jr and Corey McCullon
Defendant: Tiffany Glover, Becky Hitt, Jason Thomas and Doyle Ramey
Case Number: 3:2013cv00271
Filed: December 16, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 23 Order, this case is dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/29/2014. (jak)
March 11, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Mr. McCullon to file a status report stating whether he wishes to proceed with this action within twenty one days from the date of this Order. He must also notify the Court of his current mailing address. Further, if Mr. McCullon has been released from prison, he must file, within 21 days, an updated application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, which the Clerk of Court will provide to Mr. McCullon, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/11/2014. (jak)
January 27, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing Plaintiff Kendred's claims without prejudice for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to terminate him as a party plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/27/2014. (jak)
January 22, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to close case 3:14-cv-00001. All pleadings should be filed in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/22/2014. (jak)
January 16, 2014 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Consolidation. In accordance with the practice in the Eastern District of Arkansas, the first-filed case, McCullon v. Hitt, 3:13CV-271, is designated as the lead case. All pleadings should be filed in that case. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/16/2014. (jak)
December 17, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoner-plaintiffs. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to send IFP Applications to both Corey McCullom and Kerry Kendred, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/17/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCullon et al v. Hitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Hitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doyle Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Kendred, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey McCullon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?