Neill v. Knauts et al
Plaintiff: |
Brandy Ann Neill |
Defendant: |
C W Knauts, Shane Adam Neill, Gerald McClung and Robin Nagy |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv00011 |
Filed: |
January 13, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas |
Office: |
Jonesboro Office |
County: |
Greene |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Leon Holmes |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Thomas Ray |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 20, 2015 |
Filing
32
JUDGMENT consistent with 31 Order, this case is dismissed. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/20/2015. (jak)
|
September 5, 2014 |
Filing
22
ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file, within 30 days, a Response to 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gerald McClung and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the Local Rule and instructions set forth in this Order. Pla intiff is advised that the failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts in 18 being deemed admitted by Plaintiff; or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/05/2014. (kcs)
|
September 3, 2014 |
Filing
17
ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file, within 30 days, a Response to 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by C W Knauts and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the instructions set forth in this Order; and Plaintiff is advised that failure to timely and properly comply will result in: (a) all of the facts in 14 being deemed admitted by Plaintiff; or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/03/2014. (kcs)
|
April 7, 2014 |
Filing
12
ORDER, parties must complete discovery by 8/5/2014, and file any dispositive motions by 9/4/2014. Both Defendants are granted permission to depose Paintiff, if they so choose. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/07/2014. (kcs)
|
February 20, 2014 |
Filing
6
OPINION AND ORDER dismissing without prejudice Neill's claims against Neill and Nagy. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for McClung and Knauts, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, substituted complaint, and this Opinion and Order on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/20/2014. (jak)
|
January 15, 2014 |
Filing
3
INITIAL ORDER FOR pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/15/2014. (kcs)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?