Harrell v. Harrell

Plaintiff: Charles Kenneth Harrell
Defendant: Nathan Lee Harrell
Case Number: 3:2014cv00029
Filed: February 3, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 4 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/27/2014. (jak)
May 8, 2014 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Mr. Harrell is still required to pay the entire $350.00 filing fee. His present custodian or designee will collect the filing fee from Mr. Harrell's prison trust account and forward monthly payments to the Clerk of Court. The Clerk if Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Mississippi County Detention Center. Mr. Harrell's claims are dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this dismissal would be frivolous and not taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/8/2014. (jak)
February 7, 2014 2 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff an IFP Application and a calculation sheet along with this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/7/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrell v. Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Kenneth Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Lee Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?