Williams v State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Anita K Williams
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Consol_defendant: Jason Modde and Johnston Trucking Inc
Case Number: 3:2014cv00038
Filed: February 11, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2015 88 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 87 Order entered separately today, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/10/2015. (jak)
June 1, 2015 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Summary judgment is granted on Williams's claim of vexatious refusal to pay 47 , and denied on her claims of breach of contract and negligence 64 & 73 . Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/1/2015. (jak)
April 2, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to transfer all pending motions and related documents in Williams v. Jason Modde, 3:14-cv-00028 to the lead case 3:14-cv-00038. Parties are reminded that all future pleadings must be filed in the lead case. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/2/2015. (jak)
August 28, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff Anita Williams shall have 10 days after the entry of this Order to respond to State Farm's interrogatories and requests for production of documents. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/28/2014. (jak)
March 10, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Consolidate Cases. In accordance with the practice in the Eastern District of Arkansas, the first filed case, Williams v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, 3:14-cv-00038, is designated as the lead case. All pleadings should be filed in that case. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/10/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Sarah E. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita K Williams
Represented By: Wendell L. Hoskins, II
Represented By: Christopher Michael McMillin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Jason Modde
Represented By: Alfred F. Angulo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Johnston Trucking Inc
Represented By: Alfred F. Angulo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?