Invacare Credit Corporation Inc v. Medical Necessities of Arkansas LLC

Plaintiff: Invacare Credit Corporation Inc
Defendant: Medical Necessities of Arkansas LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv00102
Filed: April 14, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion. The Clerk is ordered to close the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/7/2017. (jak)
May 11, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court awards the requested $4,629.00 in attorney's fees to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/11/2015. (jak)
April 16, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT: Plaintiff Invacare Credit Corporation, Inc., is entitled to a judgment against Defendant, Medical Necessities of Arkansas, LLC, for $277,087.60, with interest from date of judgment until paid at the rate of 10.0% per annum, with court costs and fees of $589.00, and attorneys' fees in an amount to be awarded by the Court. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/16/2015. (jak)
July 9, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal. The Clerk shall reassign this case to another Judge drawn at random. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/9/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Invacare Credit Corporation Inc v. Medical Necessities of Arkansas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Invacare Credit Corporation Inc
Represented By: Patrick R. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Necessities of Arkansas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?