Polston v. Mississippi County Health Services et al

Plaintiff: Delmar Polston
Defendant: Mississippi County Health Services, Troxel and Kristie Stankery
Case Number: 3:2014cv00107
Filed: April 18, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 29 Order, this case is dismissed. Plaintiff Delmar Polston's claims against Mississippi County Health Services are dismissed without prejudice. Mr. Polston's claims against defendant Kristie Stankiewicz are dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/17/2016. (jak)
May 28, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file within thirty days of the entry of this Order, a Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the Fed. R. Civ. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1, and the i nstructions in this Order. Plaintiff is advised that failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in all of the facts in Defendant's summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff, or the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 5/28/2015. (jak)
December 17, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing without prejudice Defendant Dr. Troxel from this case. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/17/2014. (jak)
September 4, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to provide an address at which Dr. Troxel may be served. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of all claims against Dr. Troxel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/04/2014. (kcs)
July 2, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 5 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Plaintiff's claims against Mississippi County Health Services are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Dr. Troxel and Ms. Stankery. The U.S. Marshall is directed to serve the summons, complaint, and this Order on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/2/2014. (jak)
April 21, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/21/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polston v. Mississippi County Health Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delmar Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi County Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troxel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristie Stankery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?