Williams v. Jefferson et al

Plaintiff: Marlow Williams, Sr
Defendant: Chris Jefferson, Jo Carol Carter and Nathan Ivey
Case Number: 3:2014cv00113
Filed: April 28, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 39 Order, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/9/2015. (jak)
May 28, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Williams to file his response to defendants' motion for summary judgment, along with his response to defendants' statement of facts, within seven days of the entry of this Order. He is warned that failure to timely comply, or to provide a reasonable justification for his failure to do so, may result in defendants' motion being granted. The clerk is directed to forward a copy of this order to Williams. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/28/2015. (jak)
April 23, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Williams to either pay the $350 statutory filing fee or resubmit an IFP application within thirty days. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this lawsuit. The clerk is directed to send an IFP application to Williams. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/23/2015. (jak)
August 26, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion to Compel. Defendants are, however, directed to treat Williams's motion as a request for his jail file, and respond as set forth in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/26/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Jefferson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlow Williams, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Carol Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?