James v. Duncan et al

Plaintiff: Jason James
Defendant: Marty Boyd and Brett Duncan
Case Number: 3:2014cv00122
Filed: May 2, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice James's 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/7/2014. (jak)
July 30, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to notify this Court of his current address and his intent to continue prosecution with this action, pro se, within thirty days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiff's Complaint for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/30/2014. (jak)
July 22, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/22/2014. (jak)
May 15, 2014 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit either the $400.00 filing fee or an In Forma Pauperis Motion within thirty days of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an In Forma Pauperis Motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/15/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Duncan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?