Anderson v. Roberts McNutt Roofing and Waterproofing et al

Plaintiff: Willie J Anderson
Defendant: Roberts McNutt Roofing and Waterproofing, Trumann, City of, Micheal Fought, Dewayne Cooper, Adam and Rick Miles
Case Number: 3:2014cv00142
Filed: June 4, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The city's motion to dismiss, 33 , is granted and the claims against it are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate the city as a defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/13/2015. (jak)
January 23, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summons for defendants, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the amended complaint, 12 , and summons on defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/23/2015. (jak)
August 25, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff Willie Anderson to file a copy of his EEOC charge of discrimination within 30 days from the date of this Order so that service may be ordered upon the appropriate defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/25/2014. (jak)
July 3, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to send Anderson a copy of this Order, a copy of the earlier 3 Order, an application to proceed in forma pauperis, and a Title VII Complaint form. Anderson must either pay the $400.00 filing fee or a complete IFP form by 30 July 2014. The Clerk is directed to reassign this case at random. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/3/2014. (jak)
June 4, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to send Anderson an application to proceed in forma pauperis and a Title VII complaint form. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/4/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Roberts McNutt Roofing and Waterproofing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts McNutt Roofing and Waterproofing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trumann, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal Fought
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewayne Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?