Bailey v. Craighead County Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: Johnny Bailey
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center, Bret Duncan and Matt Hall
Case Number: 3:2014cv00144
Filed: June 6, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Bailey's claims against Duncan and Craighead County Detention Center are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Bailey's claims about conditions of confinement and preparing and blessing his meals are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Bailey's free-exercise claim against Hall is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/26/2015. (ks)
August 10, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 41 Recommendation. The Court adopts the recommendation as to exhaustion and sovereign immunity. Bailey's claims about conditions of confinement and the blessing of food are dismissed without prejudi ce for failure to exhaust. And Bailey's monetary claims against Hall in his official capacity are dismissed with prejudice based on sovereign immunity. The Court declines the recommendation on qualified immunity without prejudice and refers that piece of the summary-judgment motion back to Magistrate Judge Kearney for further consideration and a new recommendation. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/10/2015. (jak)
September 9, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 8 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Craighead County Detention Center and Bret Duncan are dismissed without prejudice as defendants. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/9/2014. (jak)
August 18, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/18/2014. (jak)
July 30, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER deeming that service is approrpriate for Defendant Matt Hall. The Clerk of Court shall prepare summons for the Defendant and the U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the 7 Amended Complaint and summons on Defendant Hall without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/30/2014. (jak) (Docket text modified on 7/30/2014 to correct the Judge who signed the document).(jak)
July 7, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit either the $400 filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty days of this Order. Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Service, which this Court construes as a Motion to direct the jail to complete the paperwork necessary to file this action, is granted. The Court will forward a copy of this Order to the Business Manager. The Clerk is directed to send to Plaintiff an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk shall forward a copy of this Order to the Craighead County Detention Facility. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/7/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Craighead County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bret Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?