Patton v. PLS Capital Group Inc et al

Plaintiff: Sheila Patton
Defendant: PLS Capital Group Inc and Brian C Miles
Case Number: 3:2014cv00146
Filed: June 9, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Patton submitted her itemized bill of costs, 24 , for $627.57. The amount is reasonable. PLS must pay it. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/1/2015. (jak)
August 18, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at the 18 August 2015 hearing, the Order to show cause, 19 , is discharged. The Court sanctions PLS Capital Group Inc. pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 37(a)(5)(A) for not responding to discovery in a diligent and timely manner. By 28 August 2015, Patton must file a list of out-of-pocket expenses incurred to get the discovery responses. The Court will award a reasonable amount in due course. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/18/2015. (jak)
April 10, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as modified 15 Motion to Compel. PLS Capital Group must respond in full to Patton's discovery by 24 April 2015. All objections, except attorney-client privilege, have been waived. The Court orders Patton to serve this Order on PLS Capital Group by email, facsimile, and U.S. Mail (return receipt required), and file proof of service by 24 April 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/10/2015. (jak)
December 31, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Sheila Patton shall have judgment against PLS Capital Group Inc for $3900.00. Post-judgment interest will accrue at 0.27% per annum from today until this Judgment is paid in full. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/31/2014. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patton v. PLS Capital Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Patton
Represented By: David M. Marco
Represented By: Larry Paul Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLS Capital Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian C Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?