Stringer v. Smith Transportation Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Keesha Stringer
Defendant: Smith Transportation Incorporated and Johnie Stein
Case Number: 3:2014cv00151
Filed: June 16, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 MOTION to Continue. This case will be removed from the trial calendar for the week of September 19, 2016. An Amended Final Scheduling Order, along with a new trial date, will be entered by separate Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/29/2016. (jak)
March 16, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that Mr. Patterson failed to state a claim against Mr. Winkler and failed to allege sufficient facts establishing that this Court has personal jurisdiction over Mr. Winkler. Therefore, the Coach grants Mr. Winkler's motion to dismiss Mr. Patterson's claims against him. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/16/2016. (jak)
February 26, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to place these filed documents under seal, 37 . Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/26/2016. (jak) (Docket text modified on 2/26/2016 to correct a typographical error.)(thd).
August 27, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. The Patterson case, 3:15-cv-00207, shall be consolidated with and into the Stringer case, 3:14-cv-00151. The Court grants the 25 Motion to Continue and hereby continues the October 26, 2015, trial date. The Court will set new deadlines and a new trial date by separate order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/27/2015. (jak) (Docket text modified on 8/27/2015 to correct a typographical error.) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stringer v. Smith Transportation Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keesha Stringer
Represented By: J. Todd Jones
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Transportation Incorporated
Represented By: Lauren Oswalt Baber
Represented By: Joseph Barrett Deacon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnie Stein
Represented By: Lauren Oswalt Baber
Represented By: Joseph Barrett Deacon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?