Rupert et al v. Mills et al

Plaintiff: Prentis Rupert and Derrick Bogan
Defendant: Larry Mills and Becky Hitt
Case Number: 3:2014cv00161
Filed: June 26, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2015 98 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 97 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/20/2015. (jak)
October 28, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 42 Partial Recommended Disposition. Defendants' 26 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' first amendment claim is DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/28/2014. (mcz)
August 12, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 11 Partial Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge. Plaintiffs' access-to-courts claims and their claims regarding access to toiletry and hygiene items are DISMISSED, without prejudice. Mr. Ruper's claim that he has unlawfully remained on "lockdown" status is also DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/12/2014. (mcz)
July 28, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket the motion to amend as the Plaintiff's amended and supplemental complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to prepare summons for each of the named Defendant s and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the complaint and the amended complaint, with any attachments, and a summons on these Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/28/2014. (jak)
June 27, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS. 1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff's two IFP Applications along with a copy of this Order. Each plaintiff must return a completed IFP Application or pay the $400.00 filing fee within thirty days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/27/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rupert et al v. Mills et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prentis Rupert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Bogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Hitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?