Lowery v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Sheryl Lowery
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2014cv00178
Filed: July 23, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion for Reconsideration because the request reiterates the argument in his motion for attorney fees, 21 , and does not demonstrate that a manifest error of law occurred. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/20/2016. (jak)
August 26, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 21 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Administration is ordered to pay $10,000 in attorney's fees to Lowery's attorney, David Throesch. Because counsel has already received $6,436.70 in EAJA fees, Throesch must refund this amount to Lowery upon receipt of the § 406(b) fees. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/26/2016. (jak)
June 1, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $6,436.70 pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/1/2015. (jak)
April 7, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 16 Order, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/7/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowery v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Lowery
Represented By: David Jerome Throesch(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?