Leija v. Mills et al

Plaintiff: Corey F Leija
Defendant: Larry Mills and Becky Hitt
Case Number: 3:2014cv00180
Filed: July 23, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Leija's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/11/2015. (jak)
August 13, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 5 Partial Recommended Disposition. Leija's claims against the Poinsett County Jail are dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/13/2014. (jak)
July 28, 2014 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Larry Mills and Becky Hitt. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the Complaint, along with any attachments, and a summons for each of these Defendants, without prepayment of fees and costs or the posting of security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/28/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leija v. Mills et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey F Leija
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Mills
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Hitt
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?