Nucor Steel-Arkansas et al v. Big River Steel LLC

Plaintiff: Nucor Steel-Arkansas and Nucor-Yamato Steel Company
Defendant: Big River Steel LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv00193
Filed: August 7, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7604
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 34 Opinion and Order, the complaint of Nucor Steel-Arkansas and Nucor Yamato Steel Company against Big River Steel, LLC, is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/25/2015. (jak)
January 15, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER authorizing David R. Taggard, Natalie J. Dekaris, and David J. Topping to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the courthouse in Little Rock, Arkansas, on Friday, January 16, 2015, subject to the rules contained within this Order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/15/2015. (jak)
January 9, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to all attorneys of record regarding the hearing scheduled in this case to begin at 9:30 a.m. on Friday, January 16, 2015. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/9/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nucor Steel-Arkansas et al v. Big River Steel LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nucor Steel-Arkansas
Represented By: Mark H. Allison
Represented By: William C. Bird, III
Represented By: Jerald N. Jones
Represented By: Michael G. Smith
Represented By: David R. Taggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nucor-Yamato Steel Company
Represented By: Mark H. Allison
Represented By: William C. Bird, III
Represented By: Jerald N. Jones
Represented By: Michael G. Smith
Represented By: David R. Taggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big River Steel LLC
Represented By: Martin T. Booher
Represented By: Adria W. Conklin
Represented By: Karen Swanson Haan
Represented By: Michael J. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?