Freeman v. Craighead County Jail et al

Plaintiff: Jeff D Freeman
Defendant: Craighead County Jail and Moyer
Case Number: 3:2014cv00207
Filed: August 25, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Freeman's claims against Craighead County Jail are dismissed withprejudice. Freeman's failure-to-protect claim against Officer Moyer is dismissed without prejudice for lack of supporting facts. Freeman's remaining claims against Officer Moyer are dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/8/2015. (ks)
July 1, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER informing Mr. Freeman that he may file a response opposing the motion for summary judgment. To be considered, the response must be filed within fourteen days of this Order. If a response is filed, Mr. Freeman must also file a separate, short statement setting forth the disputed fats that he believes must be decided at a trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/1/2015. (jak)
December 19, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 8 unopposed recommendation. Craighead County Jail is dismissed as a defendant with prejudice. To the extent Freeman asserts that Moyer failed to protect him from an inmate assault, that claim is dismissed without prejudice based on lack of supporting facts. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/19/2014. (jak)
November 21, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Mr. Freeman to proceed on his claim that Defendant Moyer acted with deliberate indifference to his medical needs. In addition, Mr. Freeman may proceed on his claim that Defendant Moyer acted with deliberate indifference to his health a nd safety following the incident in question. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Defendant Moyer and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the 1 Complaint with any attachments and a summons on defendant. Mr. Freemans's claims against the Craighead County Jail will be addressed in a separate recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/21/2014. (jak)
August 26, 2014 2 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS. Plaintiff is directed to file an IFP Application or submit the filing fee within thirty days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/26/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Craighead County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff D Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?