Payne v. Baltazar et al

Plaintiff: Don Earl Payne
Defendant: Alvaro Baltazar, Central Transport Inc and Central Transport LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv00213
Filed: September 8, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 34 order entered on this date, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/5/2015. (ks)
August 10, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and that claim is dismissed with prejudice. Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment on Payne's lost profits claims, 19 is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/10/2015. (jak)
December 12, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion to Remand. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/12/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Baltazar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Earl Payne
Represented By: Kale L. Ludwig(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvaro Baltazar
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kyle Ray Wilson(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Transport Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Kyle Ray Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Transport LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Kyle Ray Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?