Smith v. Cook et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Scott Smith
Defendant: Dale Cook, Andrew Harris, Brice Hicks, Luther Whitfleid, Octavious Bailey, Melvin and Alonzo Cummings
Case Number: 3:2014cv00221
Filed: September 23, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice Smith's complaint for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/27/2015. (jak)
November 26, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to notify this Court of his current address and his intent to continue prosecution with this action, pro se, within thirty days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiff's Complaint for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/26/2014. (jak)
November 4, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 5 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Cook, Harris, Hicks, and Whitfleid are dismissed as defendants. Smith's harassment, racial discrimination, and failure to respond to grievances claims are dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/4/2014. (jak)
October 10, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that service is appropriate for Defendants Octavious Bailey, Officer Melvin, and Alonzo Cummings. The Clerk of Court shall prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the 4 Amended Complaint and summons on Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/10/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Scott Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brice Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Whitfleid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Octavious Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alonzo Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?