Brownlee v. Mine Safety Appliances Company et al

Plaintiff: Charl Brownlee
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company, 3M Company, Pangborn Corporation, E D Bullard Company, Pulmosan Safety Equipment Corp, American Optical Corporation, Empire Abrasive Equipment Corporation, Precision Packaging Inc, Does and Doe Corporation
Cross_claimant: E D Bullard Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Pangborn Corporation, Precision Packaging Inc, 3M Company and Empire Abrasive Equipment Corporation
Cross_defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company, 3M Company, Pangborn Corporation, Pulmosan Safety Equipment Corp, American Optical Corporation, Empire Abrasive Equipment Corporation, Precision Packaging Inc, Doe Corporation, Does and E D Bullard Company
Case Number: 3:2014cv00282
Filed: December 2, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The complaint and all pending cross-claims are dismissed without prejudice. The Court confirms its prior dismissal of all claims against former defendants, and of all cross-claims by and against those former defendants, all without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/25/2016. (jak)
April 12, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as modified 61 Motion. The Final Scheduling Order 53 is suspended. The 6 September 2016 trial is cancelled. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue. It will adopt the parties' proposed deadlines, extend the other pretrial deadlines accordingly, and set a new trial date. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/12/2016. (jak)
October 22, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing without prejudice all Brownlee's claims against E.D. Bullard Company. All cross-claims by, and against E.D. Bullard Company are dismissed without prejudice. E.D. Bullard Company is no longer a party to this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/22/2015. (jak)
October 13, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court notes and appreciates the stipulation, 54 . The Court will treat the stipulation as unanimous, and enter an order dismissing all claims by and against E.D. Bullard, if no party objects by 20 October 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/13/2015. (jak)
March 23, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint notices of voluntary dismissal, 48 and 49 , noted. All of Brownlee's claims against Pangborn Corporation and Empire Abrasive Equipment Corporation are dismissed without prejudice. All cross claims, by an against, Pangborn and Empire Abrasive Equipment are dismissed without prejudice. Pangborn Corporation and Empire Abrasive Equipment Corporation are no longer parties in this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/23/2015. (jak)
February 2, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion. All of Brownlee's claims against Precision Packing are dismissed without prejudice. All cross claims by, and against, Precision Packaging are dismissed without prejudice. Precision Packaging, Inc., is no longer a party. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/2/2015. (jak)
January 6, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court set the following deadlines at the 6 January 2015 status conference. Brownlee's initial disclosures, including signed agreed authorizations, are due by 23 January 2015. Defendants must serve the agreed master discovery on Brownl ee by 9 January 2015. Brownlee' s responses to that discovery are due by 10 March 2015. The target for Brownlee' s deposition is July 2015. There's no need for a Rule 26(f) conference. A Final Scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/6/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brownlee v. Mine Safety Appliances Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charl Brownlee
Represented By: John T. Givens
Represented By: Patrick C. Malouf
Represented By: Timothy W. Porter
Represented By: Robert Allen Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company
Represented By: M. Patrick McDowell
Represented By: Charles R. Wilbanks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: J. William Manuel
Represented By: Mary Clay Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pangborn Corporation
Represented By: John P. Parsons
Represented By: Jennifer J. Skipper
Represented By: Colleen S. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E D Bullard Company
Represented By: Steve Allan Bryant
Represented By: D. Michael Huckabay, Jr.
Represented By: Kathryn Bess Knisley
Represented By: Thomas Anthony McHale
Represented By: James Tucker Sayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulmosan Safety Equipment Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Optical Corporation
Represented By: Alex T. Gray
Represented By: Megan D. Hargraves
Represented By: Ginger C. Hyneman
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Abrasive Equipment Corporation
Represented By: Ronald G. Peresich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Packaging Inc
Represented By: John P. Parsons
Represented By: Jennifer J. Skipper
Represented By: M. Christine Crockett White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: E D Bullard Company
Represented By: Steve Allan Bryant
Represented By: D. Michael Huckabay, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Anthony McHale
Represented By: James Tucker Sayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Mine Safety Appliances Company
Represented By: M. Patrick McDowell
Represented By: Charles R. Wilbanks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Pangborn Corporation
Represented By: John P. Parsons
Represented By: Colleen S. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Precision Packaging Inc
Represented By: John P. Parsons
Represented By: M. Christine Crockett White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: 3M Company
Represented By: J. William Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Empire Abrasive Equipment Corporation
Represented By: Ronald G. Peresich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company
Represented By: M. Patrick McDowell
Represented By: Charles R. Wilbanks, Jr.
Represented By: M. Patrick McDowell
Represented By: Charles R. Wilbanks, Jr.
Represented By: M. Patrick McDowell
Represented By: Charles R. Wilbanks, Jr.
Represented By: M. Patrick McDowell
Represented By: Charles R. Wilbanks, Jr.
Represented By: M. Patrick McDowell
Represented By: Charles R. Wilbanks, Jr.
Represented By: M. Patrick McDowell
Represented By: Charles R. Wilbanks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Mary Clay Morgan
Represented By: Mary Clay Morgan
Represented By: Mary Clay Morgan
Represented By: Mary Clay Morgan
Represented By: J. William Manuel
Represented By: J. William Manuel
Represented By: Mary Clay Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Pangborn Corporation
Represented By: John P. Parsons
Represented By: John P. Parsons
Represented By: John P. Parsons
Represented By: Colleen S. Welch
Represented By: John P. Parsons
Represented By: Colleen S. Welch
Represented By: John P. Parsons
Represented By: Colleen S. Welch
Represented By: John P. Parsons
Represented By: Colleen S. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Pulmosan Safety Equipment Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: American Optical Corporation
Represented By: Alex T. Gray
Represented By: Megan D. Hargraves
Represented By: Ginger C. Hyneman
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Represented By: Alex T. Gray
Represented By: Megan D. Hargraves
Represented By: Ginger C. Hyneman
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Represented By: Alex T. Gray
Represented By: Megan D. Hargraves
Represented By: Ginger C. Hyneman
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Represented By: Alex T. Gray
Represented By: Megan D. Hargraves
Represented By: Ginger C. Hyneman
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Represented By: Alex T. Gray
Represented By: Megan D. Hargraves
Represented By: Ginger C. Hyneman
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Represented By: Alex T. Gray
Represented By: Megan D. Hargraves
Represented By: Ginger C. Hyneman
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Empire Abrasive Equipment Corporation
Represented By: Ronald G. Peresich
Represented By: Ronald G. Peresich
Represented By: Ronald G. Peresich
Represented By: Ronald G. Peresich
Represented By: Ronald G. Peresich
Represented By: Ronald G. Peresich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Precision Packaging Inc
Represented By: John P. Parsons
Represented By: John P. Parsons
Represented By: John P. Parsons
Represented By: John P. Parsons
Represented By: M. Christine Crockett White
Represented By: John P. Parsons
Represented By: M. Christine Crockett White
Represented By: John P. Parsons
Represented By: M. Christine Crockett White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: E D Bullard Company
Represented By: Steve Allan Bryant
Represented By: D. Michael Huckabay, Jr.
Represented By: Kathryn Bess Knisley
Represented By: Thomas Anthony McHale
Represented By: James Tucker Sayes
Represented By: Steve Allan Bryant
Represented By: D. Michael Huckabay, Jr.
Represented By: Kathryn Bess Knisley
Represented By: Thomas Anthony McHale
Represented By: James Tucker Sayes
Represented By: Steve Allan Bryant
Represented By: D. Michael Huckabay, Jr.
Represented By: Kathryn Bess Knisley
Represented By: Thomas Anthony McHale
Represented By: James Tucker Sayes
Represented By: Steve Allan Bryant
Represented By: D. Michael Huckabay, Jr.
Represented By: Kathryn Bess Knisley
Represented By: Thomas Anthony McHale
Represented By: James Tucker Sayes
Represented By: Steve Allan Bryant
Represented By: D. Michael Huckabay, Jr.
Represented By: Kathryn Bess Knisley
Represented By: Thomas Anthony McHale
Represented By: James Tucker Sayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?