White v. Arkansas Department of Human Services et al

Plaintiff: Roberta White
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Human Services and Cindy Rowlett
Case Number: 3:2014cv00311
Filed: December 29, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: White's motion to reopen, 24 , is denied. She hasn't given the Court a good reason to set aside the Judgment and reopen this case. White's renewed motion for appointment of counsel, 26 , is denied without as prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/14/2016. (jak)
February 18, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Department and Rowlett to file a paper indicating whether Brandon Adamson or Derrick Brashers were agents authorized under the postal regulations to accept mail for the Department or Rowlett in June 2015. The Court also would appreciate defendants addressing whether the person who signed the November green card, No 25 -6 at 3, was such an agent. Response due by 24 February 2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/18/2016. (jak)
November 23, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 and 22 Motions as moot. The Court has dismissed White's complaint for lack of good service. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/23/2015. (jak)
November 19, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: White's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/19/2015. (jak)
August 17, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice Defendants' 10 Motion. White's motion for a directed verdict, 12 is denied because she failed to serve the defendants within 120 days after she filed her complaint. The Court reopens and extends White� 39;s time for service until 14 September 2015. If she does not complete good service by then, this case will be dismissed without prejudice. White must also file proof of service, so the Court will know what she has done. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/17/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Arkansas Department of Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?