Weast v. Versant Supply Chain Inc et al

Plaintiff: Brock Weast
Defendant: Versant Supply Chain Inc and Robert Bosch Tool Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv00018
Filed: January 20, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 24, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAITNIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiff's claims against separate defendant Robert Bosch Tool Corp are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/24/2015. (jak)
January 27, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal. The Clerk shall reassign this case at random by chip exchange. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/27/2015. (jak)
January 20, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER provisionally granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis in accordance with General Order 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 1/20/2015.(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weast v. Versant Supply Chain Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brock Weast
Represented By: James M. Scurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Versant Supply Chain Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch Tool Corporation
Represented By: Justin Parkey
Represented By: Paul D. Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?