Clifton v. Bailey et al

Plaintiff: Curtis Wayne Clifton
Defendant: Octavious Bailey, Alonzo Cummings, Peggy Soward, Luther Whitfield and Mississippi County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2015cv00031
Filed: January 27, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Clifton's claims against the Mississippi County Detention Center are dismissed with prejudice. Clifton's official-capacity claims are dismissed without prejudice. Clifton's individual-capacity claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/10/2016. (jak)
March 17, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Opposed partial recommendation, 6 , adopted on de novo review. Clifton's objection, 8 , is overruled. Clifton's claims against all defendants in their official capacities are dismissed without prejudice. His 1983 claims against the Mississippi County Detention Center are dismissed with prejudice because the jail can't be sued. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/17/2015. (jak)
February 4, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Bailey, Cummings, Schultz, and Whitfield. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the 2 Complaint, and summons for each defendant without prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/4/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifton v. Bailey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Wayne Clifton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Octavious Bailey
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alonzo Cummings
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Soward
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Whitfield
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?