Addison v. Duncan et al

Plaintiff: Nicholas Addison
Defendant: Brett Duncan and Craighead County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2015cv00038
Filed: January 29, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 39 Order of Dismissal entered separately today, this case is dismissed, without prejudice. The action is terminated, and it is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 2/12/2016. (ljb)
January 8, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file. on or before February 8, 2016, a response to Defendant's 34 Motion for Summary Judgment and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to timely and properly comply with this order will result in either all the facts in Defendant's summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff, or the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/8/2016. (jak)
May 28, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 14 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff's 15 Motion or Clarification is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 5/28/2015. (jak)
April 27, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Addison has another pending case, No. 3:15-cv-42 DPM, where his address is current. The Court directs the Clerk to update Addison's address and send this Order and an in forma pauperis application to Poinsett County Detention Center. Addi son must either complete and return the application, or pay the $400 filing fee, by 15 May 2015. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of his case without prejudice. Addison must keep his address current in this case too or it will be dismissed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/27/2015. (jak)
March 13, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, along with a prison calculation sheet. Plaintiff must within thirty days of the entry of this Order either pay the $400 filing fee in full or file a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must within thirty days of the entry of this Order file an Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 3/13/2015. (jak)
February 2, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/02/2015. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Addison v. Duncan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?