Edwards v. Whinfield et al

Plaintiff: Victor Lemar Edwards
Defendant: Luther Whinfield, Dale Cook, Harris, Duke Bailey, Lorenso Cunnings, Petty and Melvin
Case Number: 3:2015cv00040
Filed: February 2, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2016 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 115 Motion for pre-approval of out-of-pocket expenses for deposition costs and fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/22/2016. (jak)
August 7, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 62 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/7/2015. (jak)
June 29, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining 34 Recommendation. Construed liberally, Edwards's filings show diligence sufficient to avoid dismissal. The Court would appreciate further consideration and recommendation on the merits of the pending Motion to Dismiss, 14 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/29/2015. (jak)
May 11, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 32 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/11/2015. (jak)
May 6, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants Luther Whitfield, Octavious Bailey, Alonzo Cummings, Kenneth Melvin, and Brandon Petty, through their attorneys, have answered and supplied their correct names, 16 . The Clerk is directed to change the style of the case to reflect the Defendants' correct names. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/6/2015. (jak) (Docket entry modified on 5/6/2015 to correct the signer.) (thd).
April 10, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting unopposed recommendation, 8 . Cook and Harris are dismissed as parties. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/10/2015. (jak)
April 7, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a response to Defendants' motion to dismiss, 14 , within ten days of the date of this Order. Failure to respond to this Court's Order may result in the dismissal without prejudice of the Plaintiff's Complaint for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/7/2015. (jak)
February 24, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that service is appropriate for Defendants Whinfield, Bailey, Cunnings, Petty, and Melvin. The Clerk of Court shall prepare summons for the Defendants and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the Amended Complaint, 5 , and summons on Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/24/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Whinfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Lemar Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Whinfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorenso Cunnings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?