Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Aquino et al

Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Austin Aquino, Al Aquino and Sue Garrison
Case Number: 3:2015cv00041
Filed: February 3, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 54 Order, this case is hereby dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/4/2016. (jak)
January 12, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Nationwide's motion for summary judgment, 25 , as to Austin Aquino and Nationwide has no duty to defend him. Summary Judgment is denied as to Al Aquino. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/12/2016. (jak)
October 19, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Nationwide's motion to withdraw. Al Aquino's motion to set aside clerk's entry of default judgment, 23 , is granted. Nationwide's motion for clerk's entry of default judgment, 18 , is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/19/2015. (jak)
June 23, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: I recuse because William Jennings Stanley, defendant Al Aquino's lawyer, is on my recusal list. The Clerk shall reassign this case at random by chip exchange. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/23/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Aquino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Randy P. Murphy(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Mark D. Wankum(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Aquino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Aquino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Garrison
Represented By: Jeffrey Owen Scriber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?