Addison v. Poinsett County Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: Nicholas Cortez Addison
Defendant: Poinsett County Detention Center, Dewey, Barbara Dexter and Jerry Martin
Case Number: 3:2015cv00042
Filed: February 6, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Addison's claims against Joey Martin, Shawn Dewey, and Poinsett County Detention Center are dismissed with prejudice. The rest of Addison's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/4/2016. (jak)
June 1, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 11 Recommendation as modified. Addison's objection, 21 , is overruled. Poinsett County Detention Center is dismissed with prejudice as a defendant. Jerry Martin is dismissed without prejudice as a defendant. Addison's criminal charges claim against Joey Martin is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/1/2015. (jak)
May 6, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of Defendant Shawn Dewey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/6/2015. (jak) (Docket text modified on 5/6/2015 to include Defendant's name.) (thd).
April 27, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/27/2015. (jak)
April 10, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining unopposed recommendation, 4 . Addison has now moved for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge Kearney will handle that motion in due course. Addison's motion to dismiss Barbara Dexter, 8 , is granted. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/10/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Addison v. Poinsett County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Cortez Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poinsett County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Dexter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?