Pratcher v. Mississippi County Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: Marquis Pratcher
Defendant: Mississippi County Detention Center, Chris Stankewicz, Luther Whitfield and Stepanuk
Case Number: 3:2015cv00053
Filed: February 19, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pratcher's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/21/2015. (jak)
May 11, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing Pratcher's claims against the Mississippi County Detention Center with prejudice. Practcher's claims against Stankewicz, Whitfield, and Stepanuk in their official capacities are actually claims against Mississippi County. H is official capacity claims are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Stankewicz, Stepanuk, and Whitfield. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint, and this Order on them without prepayment o f fees and costs or security. If any of the defendants are no longer county employees, the individual responding to service must file the unserved defendant's last known private mailing address under seal. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith.. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/11/2015. (jak)
February 20, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/20/2015. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pratcher v. Mississippi County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquis Pratcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Stankewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stepanuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?