Helena Chemical Company v. Baratti et al
Plaintiff: |
Helena Chemical Company |
Defendant: |
Joe Baratti, Jr, Joe Baratti, Sr and Baratti Farms |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00077 |
Filed: |
March 20, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas |
Office: |
Jonesboro Office |
County: |
Out of State |
Presiding Judge: |
D. P. Marshall |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 19, 2017 |
Filing
41
ORDER: Joint status report 40 noted and appreciated. The stay as to Baratti Sr. is lifted as moot. The 28 Judgment against him has been discharged in Bankruptcy. The Judgment remains intact against Baratti Farms, a partnership. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/19/2017. (jak)
|
December 6, 2017 |
Filing
39
ORDER directing the parties to provide an update detailing what, if any, additional relief is sought. Status report due by 12/18/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/6/2017. (jak)
|
September 8, 2016 |
Filing
38
ORDER: Stipulation, 37 , noted, appreciated, and approved. The automatic stay remains in effect as to Joe Baratti, Sr. Execution on the judgment, 28 , is not stayed against Baratti Farms. The Court orders First Community Bank of Eastern Arkansas to pay to Helena Chemical the identified amount in the Baratti Farms account. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/8/2016. (jak)
|
November 30, 2015 |
Filing
19
ORDER granting unopposed motion to stay and compel arbitration, 15 . The motion for summary judgment, 12 , is denied without prejudice. The dispute remains stayed as to Baratti Jr. because of his bankruptcy. Joint status report due 1 January 2016, and every six months thereafter. Case stayed and administratively terminated, as to all parties. Any party may move to reopen, and confirm or challenge, any arbitration award. If no party seeks relief by 1 December 2017, the Court will reopen and dismiss the complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/30/2015. (jak)
|
October 14, 2015 |
Filing
11
ORDER: The Court appreciates the parties' stipulation, 10 . THis case remains stayed as to Joe Baratti, Jr., but will continue against Joe Baratti, Sr. and Baratti Farms. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/13/2015. (jak)
|
September 8, 2015 |
Filing
9
ORDER staying this case as to Joe Baratti Jr. On the current record, the Court can't discern whether the stay extends to the partnership. The case will continue for sure against Joe Baratti, Sr. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/8/2015. (jak)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?