Rodriguez v. Whitfield et al

Plaintiff: Felix Rodriguez
Defendant: Luther Whitfield, Chris Stankawitz, Gerald Stipanuk and Mississippi County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 3:2015cv00079
Filed: March 24, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to mail Rodriguez a new application to proceed in forma pauperis. Rodriguez has 30 days from the entry of this Order to file that application with updated information. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/28/2016. (jak)
October 17, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 76 Order, Judgment is entered for the defendants, and the case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/17/2016. (jak)
June 5, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for the Defendant Dr. Gerald Stipanuk, and the U.S. Marshal is hereby directed to serve a copy of the summons and Amended Complaint, 5 , on Defendant at the address provided under seal, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/5/2015. (jak)
May 27, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Defendants to provide to the Court, under seal, the last-known address of Defendant Stipanuk within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/27/2015. (jak)
May 14, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 7 Proposed Partial Findings and Recommendations in their entirety. Plaintiff's grievance claim against defendant Whitfield is dismissed. Defendant Mississippi County Detention Center is dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/14/2015. (jak)
April 17, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that service is appropriate for the Defendants Luther Whitfield, Chris Stankawitz, and Gerald Stipanuk. The Clerk of the Court shall prepare summons for the Defendants and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the 5 Amended Complaint and summons on the defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/17/2015. (jak)
April 2, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/2/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Whitfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Stankawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Stipanuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?