Weaver et al v. Everhome Mortgage Company et al

Plaintiff: Danny L Weaver and Stacey E Weaver
Defendant: Everhome Mortgage Company and Everbank
Case Number: 3:2015cv00083
Filed: March 26, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/11/2016. (jak)
November 19, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Everbank's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/19/2015. (jak)
April 27, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Motion to remand, 14 , denied. Motion to quash, 5 , granted. Amended complaint due by 15 May 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/27/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver et al v. Everhome Mortgage Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny L Weaver
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: Annabelle Lee Patterson
Represented By: Nicolas Heath Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey E Weaver
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: Annabelle Lee Patterson
Represented By: Nicolas Heath Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everhome Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everbank
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Represented By: Bianca Rucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?