Addison v. Mills et al

Plaintiff: Nicholas Cortez Addison
Defendant: Larry Mills, Joey Martin and Jane Does
Case Number: 3:2015cv00086
Filed: April 1, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 72 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/14/2017. (jak)
February 26, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in its entirety 40 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects. Mr. Addison's claims against the Doe defendants are dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/26/2016. (ljb)
May 4, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to dismiss. Mr. Addison's claims against Defendant Mills are dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/4/2015. (jak)
April 2, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS. Denying 1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to enclose an IFP Application along with a copy of this Order and mail them to the Plaintiff. Plaintiff must return a completed IFP application or pay the $400.00 filing fee within thirty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/2/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Addison v. Mills et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Cortez Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Mills
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Martin
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?