Grimes v. Duncan et al

Plaintiff: Melvin Wade Grimes , Jr
Defendant: Brett Duncan, Bentley and Chasity Jackson
Case Number: 3:2015cv00098
Filed: April 17, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Grimes's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/29/2015. (jak)
October 13, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change plaintiff's address of record to 1705 Strawfloor Road, Jonesboro, Arkansas 72404, and to send plaintiff copies of docket entries 23 through 31 , as well as an application for leave to proceed in forma paupe ris. Plaintiff is reminded of his obligation to pay the full filing fee, or to file an updated application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, as set forth in the Court's September 15, 2015, Order, 23 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 10/13/2015. (jak)
September 15, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to forward an IFP application to Plaintiff. Plaintiff is directed to submit the remainder of the $350 statutory filing fee, or to complete and sign the IFP application, and file it, no later than 30 days after the entry date of this order. Plaintiff's failure to do so will result in the recommended dismissal of his complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/15/2015. (jak)
August 25, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a notice of his current mailing address no later than 30 days after this order's entry date. Plaintiff's failure to do so will result in the recommended dismissal of his complaint. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to plaintiff at his address of record as well as the ADC Cummins Unit. The Clerk should include plaintiff's ADC number as set forth in his application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, 3 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/25/2015. (jak)
April 20, 2015 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to forward an in forma pauperis application, calculation sheet, and certificate to Plaintiff. No later than thirty days from the entry date of this Order, Plaintiff must either submit the full $400 filing fee or file a fully completed and signed in forma pauperis application. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 4/20/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes v. Duncan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Wade Grimes , Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Duncan
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bentley
Represented By: Benjamin D. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chasity Jackson
Represented By: Benjamin D. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?