Home Design Services Inc v. Burch Homes LLC et al

Plaintiff: Home Design Services Inc
Defendant: Burch Homes LLC and Eric Burch
Case Number: 3:2015cv00122
Filed: May 4, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice with each party to bear its or his own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/5/2016. (jak)
September 6, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER removing this case from the Court's trial docket for the week of September 19, 2016, due to settlement. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/6/2016. (jak)
July 21, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal. The Clerk will reassign this case at random by chip exchange. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/21/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home Design Services Inc v. Burch Homes LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home Design Services Inc
Represented By: Anthony M. Lawhon(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burch Homes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?