Helena Chemical Company v. Young et al
Plaintiff: Helena Chemical Company
Defendant: Vince Young and Vince Young Farms
Case Number: 3:2015cv00151
Filed: June 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/29/2017. (jak)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: 12 Status Report noted and appreciated. Next status report due by 7/6/2017. The case will remain stayed and administratively terminated until then. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/10/2017. (jak)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Status report, 10 , noted and appreciated. Next status report due by 1/6/2017. The case will remain stayed and administratively terminated until then. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/8/2016. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helena Chemical Company v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena Chemical Company
Represented By: Roger D. Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vince Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vince Young Farms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?