Willcockson et al v. Martin

Plaintiff: Leona Willcockson and Nicholas Cortez Addison
Defendant: Joey Martin
Case Number: 3:2015cv00154
Filed: June 8, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Wilcockson and Addison's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/12/2016. (jak)
October 20, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Mr. Addison to file a response opposing the motion, 33 . To be considered, the response must be filed within fourteen days of this Order. If Mr. Addison files a response, he must also file a separate, short statement setting forth the disputed facts that he believes must be decided at a trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/20/2015. (jak)
September 28, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 30 recommendation and overruling Martin's 31 objections; and denying without prejudice Martin's 22 motion to dismiss. His exhaustion-related exhibits should accompany a motion rather than an objection. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/26/2015. (ljb)
August 11, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting unopposed recommendation, 21 . Willcockson's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/11/2015. (jak)
July 21, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 12 recommendation. Addison's official-capacity claim against Martin is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/21/2015. (jak)
June 9, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS. Denying 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mr. Addison. The Clerk of Court is directed to send each plaintiff an IFP application along with a copy of this order. Each plaintiff must return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $400 filing fee within thirty days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/9/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willcockson et al v. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leona Willcockson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Cortez Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?